Rosen, Barry Philip (CPSO#: 51511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Beaumont Hospital
Royal Oak MI  48073
United States
Phone: (248) 551 7437
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Barry Rosen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARRY PHILIP ROSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1983