Rosen, Cheryl Fern (CPSO#: 51512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Dermatology Centre
8 East Wing
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5952
Fax: (416) 603-2782
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drucker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Drucker ( CPSO# 32728 )
Dr. C. Rosen ( CPSO# 51512 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
TCP5-1004
Mailbox 39
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 361-2661

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 17 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHERYL FERN ROSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987