Rosen, David Clyde (CPSO#: 25779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ph5
1300 Bloor Street
Mississauga ON  L4Y 3Z2
Phone: (905) 277-8834
Fax: (905) 272-1416
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David C. Rosen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rosen ( CPSO# 25779 )
Dr. J. Kingston ( CPSO# 32046 )

Business Address:
PH 5
1300 Bloor Street
Mississauga ON  L4Y 3Z2
Phone Number: (905) 277-8834


Corporation Name: Dr. June Kingston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rosen ( CPSO# 25779 )
Dr. J. Kingston ( CPSO# 32046 )

Business Address:
5th Floor - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-9700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID CLYDE ROSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1976