Rosen, Edward Julius (CPSO#: 11595)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Apr 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Apr 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1942

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1949 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1944
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Mar 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Apr 2000