Rosen, Gary Howard (CPSO#: 24643)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1972
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 24 Nov 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 1999