Rosen, Gili (CPSO#: 59721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Names: Meir-Rosen, Gili (used until: 05 Jul 1993 )     Meir, Gili (used until: 24 Feb 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
343 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3H 1T1
Phone: (416) 785-8412
Fax: (416) 785-8324
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gili Rosen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Rosen ( CPSO# 59721 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
343 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3H 1T1
Phone Number: (416) 785-8412

Business Address:
3560 Bathurst Street
Apolex 7
Toronto ON  M6A 2E1
Phone Number: (416) 785-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILI ROSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1989