Rosen, Lawrence Jehuda (CPSO#: 14894)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 24 Apr 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Apr 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Nov 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1954
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2000
Terms and conditions amended Effective: 13 Sep 2000
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Nov 2000
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 07 Feb 2001
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 24 Apr 2001

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 24 Apr 2001
Summary:

 On April 24, 2001, the Discipline Committee accepted Dr. Rosen(s guilty plea and found him guilty, 
 under subsection 34(3)(c) of The Medical Act, of misconduct in a professional respect regarding 
 sexual impropriety.

The Committee directed that Dr. Rosen be reprimanded and that the Registrar 
 revoke Dr. Rosen(s certificate of registration to take effect immediately.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 24, 2001


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 02 May 2000
Summary:

 In May 2000, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Rosen guilty of professional misconduct in that he 
 engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient, sexually abused patients, failed to retain the 
 required records for a patient for a period of six years after the date of the last entry in the 
 record and unprofessional conduct.

On September 13, 2000, the Discipline Committee ordered the 
 following penalty:

Dr. Rosen be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the 
 register. 

the Registrar suspend Dr. Rosen’s certificate of registration for a period of six 
 months, three months of which will be suspended on the following conditions (the 
 “suspension”):
Dr. Rosen attends and successfully completes a suitable course on boundaries 
 approved by the Registrar within six months; 
provides a letter of credit to the College within 
 thirty days of the date of this order becoming final in the sum of $10,000 for a period of five 
 years  for funding for therapy for each of the complainants;
Dr. Rosen continues, as a term, 
 condition and restriction on his certificate of registration, the attached monitoring agreement, 
 in which he has agreed to have a nurse present for any examination or procedure performed on 
 female patients, subject to the exception set out in sub-paragraph (d) below; and
Dr. Rosen may 
 examine minor female patients in the presence of their parents without the presence of a 
 nurse.

3.	the suspension will commence on a date to be fixed by the Registrar.

4.	any breach of 
 the terms and conditions set out in this order will be cause for the immediate institution of the 
 remaining three month suspension period and could be cause for further disciplinary proceedings. 
 

5.	Dr. Rosen to pay the costs of these proceedings fixed in the sum of $5,000.00, said costs to 
 be paid within ten months of the date of this order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 10, 1999