Rosen, Robin Joan (CPSO#: 68149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thornhill Medical Centre
18 Centre Street
Thornhill ON  L4J 1E9
Phone: (905) 889-3634
Fax: (905) 889-3986
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBIN JOAN ROSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1996