Rosen, Wayne Stephen (CPSO#: 63701)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Queen's University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Aug 2001