Rosenbaum, Murray (CPSO#: 55796)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2012