Rosenberg, Hans (CPSO#: 84804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19002
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Rosenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 84804 )
Dr. E. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 87184 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-5555

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Department of Internal Medicine
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899


Corporation Name: Hans Rosenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 84804 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-5555

Business Address:
501 Smyth Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANS ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008