Rosenberg, Herschel Charles (CPSO#: 51513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Oct 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8237
Fax: (519) 685-8584
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H.C. Rosenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 51513 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HERSCHEL CHARLES ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1983