Rosenberg, Jarred Errol (CPSO#: 91239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jarred Rosenberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 91239 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JARRED ERROL ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013