Rosenberg, Joseph Ira (CPSO#: 64904)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone: (416) 256-9200
Fax: (416) 256-9201
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

135 Queen's Plate Drive, Suite 140
Toronto ON  M9W 6V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 231-5229
Fax: (416) 231-5770
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joseph Rosenberg + Hedy Steinberg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Steinberg ( CPSO# 59632 )
Dr. J. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 64904 )

Business Address:
210 - 2401 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4P 3H1
Phone Number: (416) 485-9044

Business Address:
406 - 100 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 5G4
Phone Number: (416) 256-9200

Business Address:
140 - 135 Queen's Plate Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 6V1
Phone Number: (416) 231-5229

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 05 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH IRA ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Dec 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995