Rosenberg, Lawrence (CPSO#: 57964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Oct 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Oct 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3775 Cote Sainte Catherine Road
Montreal QC  H3T 1E2
Phone: (514) 340-8222 Ext. 25111

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAWRENCE ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 May 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1988