Rosenberg, Morgan Stacey (CPSO#: 90867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Endoscopy Clinic
790 Bay Street
Suite 700
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone: (416) 551-6006
Fax: (416) 551-6009
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Digestive Health Clinic
330 Hwy 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P1
Canada
Phone: (905) 707-5007
Fax: (905) 707-5008
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Digestive Health Clinic
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: 905-683-1700
Fax: 905-683-2577
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Klevan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rosenberg ( CPSO# 90867 )
Dr. A. Klevan ( CPSO# 84734 )

Business Address:
510 - 330 Highway 7 East
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Phone Number: (905) 707-5007

Business Address:
700 - 790 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 551-6006

Business Address:
1031 Brock Road
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Phone Number: (905) 683-1700

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MORGAN STACEY ROSENBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBERG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2014