Rosenberg, Robert Arlen (CPSO#: 53104)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 02 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Nov 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 20 Jun 1983 to 19 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 May 2003
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 May 2003
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 02 Nov 2006

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Feb 2003
Summary:

On February 5, 2003, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, found Dr. Robert Arlen 
Rosenberg to have committed acts of professional misconduct pursuant to the Health Professions Procedural Code.    
 
On March 21, 2003, the Discipline Committee ordered, inter alia, that Dr. Rosenberg's certificate of registration be revoked 
immediately. 
 
On April 15, 2003, Dr. Rosenberg appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court.    On May 7, 
2003, pursuant to subsection 25(1) of the Statutory Powers and Procedures Act, the Court granted Dr. Rosenberg's motion to 
stay the decision pending the outcome of the appeal on the condition that terms, conditions and limitation be imposed on his 
certificate of registration effective May 7, 2003. 
 
On June 16 2005, the Divisional Court heard the appeal. On September 14, 2005, the Divisional Court released its decision and 
reasons dismissing the appeal.Therefore, the decision of the Discipline Committee went into in effect. 
 
On September 28, 2005, Dr. Rosenberg filed a Notice of Motion for Leave to Appeal to the Court of Appeal. The decision of the 
Discipline Committee remained in effect. On January 17, 2006, Dr. Rosenberg brought a motion before the Court of Appeal to 
stay the penalty order of the Discipline Committee of March 21, 2003 upheld by the Divisional Court on September 14, 2005, 
pending the decision of the Court of Appeal. The Court of Appeal granted the stay on the condition that Dr. Rosenberg ensure 
that a third party monitor, who is a member of a regulated health profession and who is approved by the College, attend all 
medical examinations of female patients that he conducts, including counselling, palliative care, hospital visits and examination 
of female children in the company of a parent. Dr. Rosenberg was permitted to propose other monitors subject to the College's 
approval. 
 
As from 11:59 p.m., January 17, 2006, the College imposed terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration 
held by Dr. Robert Arlen Rosenberg, pursuant to the order of the Court of Appeal.    
 
On November 2, 2006, the Ontario Court of Appeal dismissed Dr. Rosenberg's appeal. 
 
The terms, conditions and limitations imposed on January 17, 2006 are no longer in effect. The certificate of registration, issued 
in the name of Dr. Robert Arlen Rosenberg, is revoked effective November 2, 2006 at 5:00    p.m. 
 
 
 
 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 02 Nov 2006
Hearing Date(s): Feb 11, 2002