Rosenbloom, Andrea (CPSO#: 67244)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1993


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3030 Lawrence Avenue East #301
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 431-0041
Fax: (416) 431-0042
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosenbloom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Dr. A. Rosenbloom ( CPSO# 67244 )

Business Address:
301 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 431-0041

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital
General Site
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Business Address:
Scarborough Hospital
Grace Division
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2400

Business Address:
455 Fairlawn Avenue
Toronto ON  M5M 1T9
Phone Number: (416) 783-5155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 25 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. ANDREA ROSENBLOOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENBLOOM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1993