Rosenstein, Karen Anne (CPSO#: 73240)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: Neugebauer, Karen Anne (used until: 15 May 2005 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ANNE ROSENSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 1999 to 28 Feb 1999
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2000