Rosenthal, Alana Joanne (CPSO#: 72505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 100
235 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 466-1311
Fax: (416) 466-9629
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

North York General Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000 Ext. 4690
Fax: (416) 756-6449
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALANA JOANNE ROSENTHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENTHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2002