Rosenthal, Eva Etta (CPSO#: 62342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 202
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone: (905) 737-8400
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Gibson Long Term Care
1925 Steeles Avenue East
North York ON  M2H 2H3
Canada
Phone: (416) 493-4666
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Gibson Retirement Residence
1955 Steeles Ave. East
North York ON  M2H 3P1
Canada
Phone: (416) 498-5588
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eva E. Rosenthal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 14 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Rosenthal ( CPSO# 62342 )

Business Address:
250 Harding Boulevard West
Suite 202
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-8400

Business Address:
1925 Steeles Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2H 2H3
Phone Number: (416) 493-4666

Business Address:
1955 Steeles Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2H 3P1
Phone Number: (416) 498-5588

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EVA ETTA ROSENTHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENTHAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1991