Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Rosenthal, Robert Mark (CPSO#: 60985)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
48 Sheppard Avenue West
North York ON  M2N 1M2
Phone: (416) 222-1477
Fax: (416) 222-5707
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert M. Rosenthal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Rosenthal ( CPSO# 60985 )

Business Address:
Sheppard Beecroft Medical Clinic
48 Sheppard Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2N 1M2
Phone Number: (416) 222-1477

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MARK ROSENTHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENTHAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1990