Rosenthal, Stephen Eli (CPSO#: 61625)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Oct 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3755 Cote st catherine
montreal QC  H3T 1E2
Phone: (514) 340-8222 Ext. 25568
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3755 cote st catherine
montreal QC  H3T 1E2
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Sep 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN ELI ROSENTHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSENTHAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Oct 2009