Rosman, David Eli (CPSO#: 63059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Upper Thornhill Medical Centre
Suite 203
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (905) 303-9331
Fax: (905) 303-9337
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. D. Rosman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Rosman ( CPSO# 63059 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (905) 303-9331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 16 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ELI ROSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSMAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 1991