Rosman, Michael Alexander (CPSO#: 25577)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 08 Nov 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1973
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 08 Nov 1995

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Sep 1994
Summary:

 In the course of a Discipline Hearing which began in June 1994, Dr. Rosman pleaded guilty to a 
 charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 61(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1990, 
 as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to 
 practice.  The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and in a decision which was released in 
 September 1994, found Dr. Rosman guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee 
 ordered on September 6, 1994, that Dr. Rosman's licence to practice be revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 08 Nov 1995
Hearing Date(s): Jun 27, 1994