Rosner, Jodi Lynne Stewart (CPSO#: 71146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 745-5290
Fax: (519) 745-7649
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jodi Rosner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rosner ( CPSO# 71146 )

Business Address:
404 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 745-5290

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JODI LYNNE STEWART ROSNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001