Rosnowska-Perera, Elzbieta (CPSO#: 31283)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 16 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Public Service Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014