Rosoph, Leslie Andrew (CPSO#: 61606)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500 Cassells Street
North Bay ON  P1B 3Z7
Phone: (705) 476-3376
Fax: (705) 476-3967
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Rosoph Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Rosoph ( CPSO# 61606 )

Business Address:
500 Cassells Street
North Bay ON  P1B 3Z7
Phone Number: (705) 476-3376

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia
USA - Vermont

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 23 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLIE ANDREW ROSOPH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSOPH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1989