Ross, Barbara McNichol (CPSO#: 33506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Stanford, Barbara Mcnichol (used until: 14 Apr 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Barbara Ross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick
Nova Scotia
Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA MCNICHOL ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1987
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2012