Ross, Bradley Alexander (CPSO#: 103131)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huron Community Health Team
32B-1 Centennial Drive
Seaforth ON  N0K 1W0
Phone: (519) 600-2273
Fax: 519-600-2500
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

377 Turnberry Street
Brussels ON  N0G 1H0
Canada
Phone: 519-600-2273
Fax: 519-600-2500
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Seaforth Community Hospital Seaforth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRADLEY ALEXANDER ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2016