Ross, Dana Ilene (CPSO#: 62545)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 400
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone: (519) 954-3648
Fax: (519) 954-3600
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dana Ross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ross ( CPSO# 62545 )

Business Address:
400 - 18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone Number: (519) 954-9648

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANA ILENE ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1991