Ross, David Burns (CPSO#: 53088)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 732 Butterworth Drive Northwest, Edmonton, AB T6R 2M7
Date Received: 03 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016