Ross, David Jaques (CPSO#: 51522)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 723-8551
Fax: (905) 721-6651
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Malvern Sleep Clinic
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 282-9119
Fax: (416) 282-4141
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Lakeridge Health Corporation
Oshawa Hospital Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-7711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David J. Ross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ross ( CPSO# 51522 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corporation
Oshawa Hospital Site
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 723-8711

Business Address:
1371 Nielson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 282-9119

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JAQUES ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 1984