Ross, Donald Cambell (CPSO#: 11660)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Oct 2014

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1945

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Instructions: For medical record inquiries please contact Dr. Ross at 248 649 2773.
Date Received: 08 Sep 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1950 RCPSC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jan 1959 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1945
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Sep 1948
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Feb 1949
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Apr 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Oct 2014

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: October 7, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
A. PREAMBLE
(1) I, Dr. Ross, certificate of registration number 11660, am a member of the College. The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.
(2) I, Dr. Ross, acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation under section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code (the “Investigation”) by the College regarding whether I have maintained the standard of practice of the profession and whether I am incompetent in the practice of medicine.
(3) I, Dr. Ross, acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation and that the concerns arising in the Investigation were not proven before the Discipline Committee.
B. UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
(4) I, Dr. Ross, hereby resign from the College effective 07-10, 2014, (the “Effective Date”).
(5) I, Dr. Ross, hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario after the Effective Date.
(6) I, Dr. Ross, agree that in the event that the College should become aware that I have either applied, re-applied or attempted to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician or for a certificate of registration, or equivalent to practise medicine in Ontario after the Effective Date, the College shall in its sole discretion, have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and shall have the right to re-commence the Investigation it terminated as a result of this
(11) I, Dr. Ross, acknowledge and confirm that I have read and understand the terms and conditions provided in this Undertaking, and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(12) I, Dr. Ross, acknowledge that the terms of this undertaking will be entered on the register as information that is available to the public.