Ross, Douglas Cameron (CPSO#: 52721)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room D0-210
Hand & Upper Limb Centre
St Josephs' Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 646-6048
Fax: (519) 646-6049
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. C. Ross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Ross ( CPSO# 52721 )

Business Address:
Hand & Upper Limb Centre
St. Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
Room D0-210
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 646-6048

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS CAMERON ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1984