Ross, Heather Joan (CPSO#: 59901)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 May 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
11 PMB 137
585 Universtiy Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-3482
Fax: (416) 340-4134
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Heather Ross Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ross ( CPSO# 59901 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
11PMB-137
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-3482

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEATHER JOAN ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 May 1996