Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ross, Ian Beaudoin (CPSO#: 61531)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 330
630 Raymond Avenue
Pasadena CA  91105
United States
Phone: (626) 793-8194
Fax: (626) 793-3664

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 02 Sep 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN BEAUDOIN ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1989