Ross, James William Mackenzie (CPSO#: 88247)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Nov 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
Zone A2
800 Commissioners Road East
PO Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 65178
Fax: (519) 646-6211
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

FEMAP
860 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H8
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 65178
Fax: 519-646-6211
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES WILLIAM MACKENZIE ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 May 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2011