Ross, Michael Stephen (CPSO#: 30515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Dec 1978

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
604 - 208 BLOOR STREET WEST
TORONTO M5R 0A4
Toronto ON  M5R 2L4
Phone: (416) 567-8141
Fax: 416-485-5554
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL STEPHEN ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Dec 1978

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 03 Apr 1984
Summary:

 In April 1984, Dr. Ross pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 Ontario Regulation 448/80, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
 profession, contrary to s. 27(21).  Dr. Ross also pleaded guilty to a charge of professional 
 misconduct, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Discipline Committee accepted these pleas and found Dr. Ross 
 guilty of professional misconduct.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Ross' licence to 
 practice be suspended for a period of two months.  The Committee also ruled that for a period of 
 thirty months conditions be placed on Dr. Ross' licence, such that all new female potential 
 patients under the age of thirty years would be discussed with, and approved by, a specialist 
 psychiatrist who would in turn report to the Registrar at six-monthly intervals indicating an 
 acceptable standard of patient care.  During this period, Dr. Ross was also to waive his right of 
 confidentiality with his psychoanalyst, and direct him to submit a report to the Registrar at 
 intervals of six months, outlining his progress in therapy.  Failure to meet these conditions 
 would result in revocation of licence.  The Committee further ordered that these penalties be 
 recorded on the Register, and recommended that the Doctor's name be published.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 02 Apr 1984