Ross, Peter Alexander (CPSO#: 74422)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Saint John Regional Hospital 400 University Avenue Saint John NB E2L 4L4
Date Received: 26 May 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 07 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017