Ross, Peter Kenneth (CPSO#: 70765)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 09 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 09 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2008
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Sep 2008