Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Ross, Stacey Anne (CPSO#: 69239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2nd Floor
1450 Highway 2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone: (905) 721-4946
Fax: (905) 721-6170
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STACEY ANNE ROSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1997