Rossignol, Benoit (CPSO#: 85406)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:UNIVERSITE DE BREST, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jul 2006 to 09 Oct 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 10 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: January 16, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. Benoit Rossignol, to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Registration Department):

I, Dr. Benoit Rossignol:

1). Hereby undertake never to apply or reapply for registration for a licence to practice medicine in Ontario or in any other jurisdiction in Canada.
2). Consent to the terms of the undertaking being entered on the Register as information that is available to the public.
3). Undertake to successfully complete a course approved by the College in the ethical issues arising in the intensive care unit and to provide proof of successful completion within 1 year of the execution of this undertaking.
4). Acknowledge that in exchange for this undertaking, the College agrees not to proceed with the discipline referral of allegations that I failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and engaged in conduct that would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional, on the basis that I administered a neuro-muscular blocking agent to a patient who had been removed from mechanical ventilation. I admit I administered the neuro-muscular blocking agent to the patient. I acknowledge that the College has in its possession an expert report that concluded that the use of the drug was inappropriate and that there is no acceptable indication for its use in the patient given the patient’s clinical situation at the time.