Rosso, Dominic (CPSO#: 62250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: 905-848-7100 Ext. 3497
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dominic Rosso Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Grenier ( CPSO# 59494 )
Dr. D. Rosso ( CPSO# 62250 )

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7549

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOMINIC ROSSO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSSO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1991