Rostom, Alaa Mostafa Kamel Ahmed (CPSO#: 65112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
A1 Endoscopy Unit
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 10215
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alaa Rostom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rostom ( CPSO# 65112 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
A1 Endoscopy Unit
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4221

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8222

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 01 Oct 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAA MOSTAFA KAMEL AHMED ROSTOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSTOM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1993