Rotbard, Morris (CPSO#: 25691)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1973

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
521 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5H1
Phone: (416) 694-1400
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Morris Rotbard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rotbard ( CPSO# 25691 )

Business Address:
202 - 521 Victoria Park Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5H1
Phone Number: (416) 694-1400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MORRIS ROTBARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTBARD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973