Roth, Kathryn Elizabeth (CPSO#: 79112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: Marshall, Kathryn Elizabeth (used until: 29 Jun 2004 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
Department of Otolaryngology
Section B2-501
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6124
Fax: (519) 646-6173
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Regional Cancer Program
800 Commissioners Rd East
London ON  N6A 4W9
Canada
Phone: 519-685-8500 Ext. 53131
Fax: 519-685-8012
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kathryn Roth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Roth ( CPSO# 79112 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Program
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Care
Department of Otolaryngology
Section B2-501
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6124

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN ELIZABETH ROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2009