Roth, Nathan Lewis (CPSO#: 55963)

Current Status: Active Member - CPSO Staff as of 07 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 317
2330 Kennedy Road
Toronto ON  M1T 0A2
Phone: (416) 609-8868
Fax: (416) 609-8711
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

379 Church Street
5th floor
Markham ON  L6B 0T1
Canada
Phone: (905) 471-7863
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nathan Roth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Roth ( CPSO# 55963 )

Business Address:
317 - 2330 Kennedy Road
Toronto ON  M1T 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 609-8868

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 26 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATHAN LEWIS ROTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1985