Rothbart, Peter (CPSO#: 21860)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Nov 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Nov 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 05 Dec 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1969
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Nov 2017

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Rothbart’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Rothbart engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct including: dealings with Toronto Public Health in relation to an infection outbreak at the Rothbart Centre in 2012. It is also alleged that Dr. Rothbart is incompetent and/or failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in that his role as Medical Director of an OHP failed to ensure that the Rothbart Centre implemented and maintained appropriate infection control practices in keeping with accepted standards for an accredited Leve12 OHP.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)