Rothenstein, Jeffrey Marc (CPSO#: 81133)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Regional Cancer Center
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 2802
Fax: (905) 721-6103
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough General Hospital
Oncology Clinic
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-8113
Fax: (416) 431-8279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Rothenstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rothenstein ( CPSO# 81133 )

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8113

Business Address:
Durham Regional Cancer Centre
Lakeridge Hospital
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY MARC ROTHENSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROTHENSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008